Global Patent Index - EP 0999407 A2

EP 0999407 A2 2000-05-10 - Double headlamp adaptive device for motor-vehicles, with microlens matrices

Title (en)

Double headlamp adaptive device for motor-vehicles, with microlens matrices

Title (de)

Adaptiver Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer mit Mikrolinsenmatrixen

Title (fr)

Phare adaptatif pour véhicules automobiles avec matrices de microlentilles

Publication

EP 0999407 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122136 A

Priority

IT TO980933 A

Abstract (en)

A double headlamp adaptive lighting device for motor-vehicles, comprises a first headlamp (3) to generate a predetermined basic light beam and a second headlamp (4) having a pair of microlens matrices (11, 12) movable relative to each other so as to be able to select a plurality of different additional beams which are added to the basic beam to generate different total beams. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1721 (2013.01); F21V 5/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0738904 A1 19961023 - MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999407 A2 20000510; EP 0999407 A3 20010905; IT 1305161 B1 20010410; IT TO980933 A1 20000505

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021224

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 14/00 A, 7F 21S 8/10 B, 7B 60Q 1/08 B, 7F 21W 101:10 Z

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI