Global Patent Index - EP 0999417 A2

EP 0999417 A2 2000-05-10 - Ventilating system for a roof

Title (en)

Ventilating system for a roof

Title (de)

Dachentlüftungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de ventilation pour toiture

Publication

EP 0999417 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120864 A

Priority

DE 19850555 A

Abstract (en)

A roof venting tube (3) is the main constituent of the venting system (1) and works with devices for conducting air flow in the direction of the free tube end. The tube is provided with a cover cap (2) which can be fitted to the free end of the tube. The cap consists of a top (5) and walls (8) connecting to the outer edge areas (6,7) of the top. Outside the free flow cross-section (16) of the tube, cap ends (17,18) extend in the direction of a roof surface of the building. The cap ends and the devices for flow conduit limit flow outlet apertures (30) accessible crossways to the longitudinal direction of the roof venting tube.

Abstract (de)

Ein Dachentlüftungssystem 1 umfaßt ein Dachentlüftungsrohr 3, Mittel zur Strömungsleitung für in Richtung des freien, über Dach geführten Rohrendes des Dachentlüftungsrohrs 3 strömende Außenluft und eine Abdeckkappe 2. Die Abdeckkappe 2 ist an bzw. über dem freien Rohrende anbringbar. Ein Kappendach 5 weist sich an äußere Randbereiche 6, 7 des Kappendachs 5 anschließende Kappenwände 8 mit außerhalb des freien Strömungsquerschnitts 16 des Dachentlüftungsrohrs 3 befindlichen, in Richtung einer Dachfläche ragenden Kappenenden 17, 18 auf. Von den Kappenenden 17, 18 sind die Mittel zur Strömungsleitung beabstandet und gegenüberliegend am Dachentlüftungsrohr 3 angeordnet. Die Kappenenden 17, 18 definieren mit den Mitteln zur Strömungsleitung der Außenluft quer zur Längsrichtung des Dachentlüftungsrohrs 3 zugängliche Strömungsaustrittsöffnungen 30. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1471 (2013.01); F24F 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999417 A2 20000510; EP 0999417 A3 20021030; DE 19850555 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI