Global patent index - EP 0999422 A3

EP 0999422 A3 2000-08-23 - Vacuum dryer device

Title (en)

Vacuum dryer device

Title (de)

Vakuumtrocknungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de séchage sous vide

Publication

EP 0999422 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99121432 A

Priority

IT UD980055 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999422A2] Vacuum dryer device (10) comprising at least a heatable work surface (12), on which the product to be dried is suitable to be arranged, and cover means which can be coupled with said work surface (12) so as to define an air-tight chamber inside which a depression is created, a condensation apparatus being included comprising at least a bundle of tubes (27) wherein cooling fluid circulates, cooperating with each work surface (12), said bundle of tubes (27) comprising inlet collectors (28a) and outlet collectors (28b) connected to each other by respective conduits (29), said bundle of tubes (27) having a substantially rectilinear longitudinal development extending substantially for the entire length of the relative work surface (12), said inlet collector (28a) and said outlet collector (28b) being arranged axially aligned with each other in correspondence with two opposite sides (12d) of the relative work surface (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 5/04; C14B 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/58 (2006.01); F26B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/58 (2013.01); F26B 5/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999422 A2 20000510; EP 0999422 A3 20000823; IT 246338 Y1 20020408; IT UD980055 U1 20000502

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI