Global Patent Index - EP 0999425 A1

EP 0999425 A1 2000-05-10 - Projectile for creating calibrated fragments

Title (en)

Projectile for creating calibrated fragments

Title (de)

Geschoss zur Herstellung von kalibrierten Splittern

Title (fr)

Projectile à fragmentation calibrée

Publication

EP 0999425 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402709 A

Priority

FR 9813941 A

Abstract (en)

The missile has a metal outer case (1), an explosive charge (4) and an intermediate shell (5) covered with a network of grooves aligned with the fragmentation lines (12) in the outer case. The intermediate shell is made partly from an elastomer or other material with a low acoustic impedance. The grooves in it are in a polygonal e.g. hexagonal or parallelogram configuration and designed to direct the shock waves from the exploding charge and produce secondary fragments (11) between the main fragments (10) of the case in a ratio of 3: 1 or 2: 1.

Abstract (fr)

Cette invention présente un projectile multi-missions à paroi épaisse destiné à la pénétration des abris bétonnés ou à la fragmentation. Ce projectile est équipé d'une enveloppe intermédiaire (5) destinée à calibrer la fragmentation des éclats selon deux classes de masses dans un rapport de 5 à 10. Les éclats secondaires sont obtenus au nombre de trois ou quatre par éclat principal selon l'efficacité recherchée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999425 A1 20000510; FR 2785672 A1 20000512; FR 2785672 B1 20050826

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020225

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI