Global Patent Index - EP 0999426 A1

EP 0999426 A1 2000-05-10 - Sabot for sub-caliber projectile

Title (en)

Sabot for sub-caliber projectile

Title (de)

Treibspiegel für Unterkalibergeschoss

Title (fr)

Sabot pour projectile sous-calibre

Publication

EP 0999426 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119459 A

Priority

CH 223398 A

Abstract (en)

The anchorage is formed by grooves (6,6') arranged on the column (1,41) in which annular projections (8,8') grip onto an axial boring (7,49) of the cartridge body (4,44). The distance of the first projection from the break-off points (22,22') and the height of the projections are calculated so that the deformation takes place on the break-off points (22,22') in the elastic region at specific spread assembly of the segments. In the cartridge for sub-caliber bullet, a column with cartridge body (4,44) is anchored in the cartridge case (3,43). The cartridge case (3,.43) encompasses partially the front and back ends of the column (1,41) and at least partially the cartridge body (4,44). The cartridge body (4,44) is divided into segments by slits (20,20') which are borders on an one end of the cartridge body (4,44) by breaking points (22,22').

Abstract (de)

Bei diesem Treibspiegel (2) wird die Verankerung des Pfeilgeschosses (1) mit dem Treibspiegelkörper (4) durch am Pfeilgeschoss (1) angeordnete Rillen (6), in welche in einer Axialbohrung (7) des Treibspiegelkörpers vorgesehene ringförmige Vorsprünge (8) eingreifen, gebildet. Der Abstand des ersten Vorsprungs von den Sollbruchstellen des Treibspiegelkörpers (4) und die Höhe der Vorsprünge sind derart gewählt, dass die Verformung an den Sollbruchstellen bei montagebedingter Spreizung der Segmente im elastischen Bereich liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 14/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/061 (2013.01); F42B 14/062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999426 A1 20000510; EP 0999426 B1 20021113; AT 227837 T 20021115; CA 2287021 A1 20000506; CA 2287021 C 20041005; DE 59903387 D1 20021219; DK 0999426 T3 20030303; ES 2185286 T3 20030416; NO 317767 B1 20041213; NO 995432 A 20000508; NO 995432 D0 19991105; US 6324986 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RWM SCHWEIZ AG

- Free text: OERLIKON CONTRAVES PYROTEC AG#BIRCHSTRASSE 155#8050 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- RWM SCHWEIZ AG#BIRCHSTRASSE 155#8050 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0999426E

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185286 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903387 20021219

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227837 T 20021115

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSSMANN, RUDOLF

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BURRI, JAKOB

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI