Global Patent Index - EP 0999432 A2

EP 0999432 A2 2000-05-10 - Method of operating an electronic dosing system and dosing system for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method of operating an electronic dosing system and dosing system for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines elektronischen Dosiersystems und Dosiersystem zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d' opération d' un système de dosage électronique et système de dosage pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0999432 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120656 A

Priority

DE 19850841 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves reading or writing device-specific parameters or user parameters or routines for operating processes or a program or at least part of a program in to a read-write memory (20). The hand dosing device (42) may be remotely operated. The hand dosing device (42) has a drive device (1) with an electric drive (7) and at least one displacement device (2) that can be driven by the drive device to dose fluid. A software-driven electronic control unit (3) operates the drive device and has at least one non-volatile read-write memory (20). An electric power supply (29) is provided for the electric drive and the control unit. A data interface (17) connected to the control unit has a data processor and a data transfer device, which has a data interface to connect the data interface of the dosing device to the data processor. An Independent claim is included for a dosing system.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines elektronischen Dosiersystems mit einer elektronischen Handdosiervorrichtung, die eine einen elektrischen Antrieb aufweisende Antriebseinrichtung, mindestens eine von der Antriebseinrichtung antreibbare Verdrängungseinrichtung zum Dosieren von Flüssigkeit, eine programmgesteuerte elektronische Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung insbesondere für den Antrieb, mindestens einen nicht-flüchtigen Schreib/Lese-Speicher, eine elektrische Spannungsquelle insbesondere für den elektrischen Antrieb und die elektronische Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung und eine mit der elektronischen Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung verbundene Datenschnittstelle aufweist, mit einer Datenverarbeitungsanlage, und mit einer Datentransfereinrichtung, die eine Datenschnittstelle zum Verbinden der Datenschnittstelle der Dosiervorrichtung mit der Datenverarbeitungsanlage aufweist, wobei mittels der Datenverarbeitungsanlage über die Datenschnittstellen gerätetypspezifische und/oder gerätespezifische Parameter und/oder Anwenderparameter und/oder Routinen für die Durchführung von Betriebsabläufen und/oder das Programm und/oder mindestens ein Programmteil in den Schreib-/Lese-Speicher einschreibbar und/oder aus diesem auslesbar sind und/oder die Handdosiervorrichtung fernsteuerbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); G01F 13/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0227 (2013.01); B01L 2300/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999432 A2 20000510; EP 0999432 A3 20010228; EP 0999432 B1 20040707; EP 0999432 B2 20080924; DE 19850841 A1 20000525; JP 2000234948 A 20000829; US 6778917 B1 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-09-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20080924

2008-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-09-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: METTLER-TOLEDO AG

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-07-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: METTLER-TOLEDO GMBH

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: METTLER-TOLEDO AG

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-06-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: METTLER-TOLEDO AG

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909898

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031027

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FI FR GB LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01F 11/02 A, 7B 01L 3/02 B

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPPENDORF AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI