Global Patent Index - EP 0999482 A3

EP 0999482 A3 2001-03-28 - Annual calendar mechanism

Title (en)

Annual calendar mechanism

Title (de)

Jährlicher Kalendermechanismus

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de quantième annuel

Publication

EP 0999482 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99120775 A

Priority

CH 221198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999482A2] Mechanism comprises a kinematic connection between a clockwork moving body and a day advance mechanism (8), a month advance mechanism (9) comprising a toothed wheel with shortened teeth and five complete teeth (19) and an intermediate mechanism (10) that meshes with the day advance mechanism and the month advance mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/247 (2006.01); G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/2536 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999482 A2 20000510; EP 0999482 A3 20010328; EP 0999482 B1 20071114; CH 692538 A5 20020715; DE 69937532 D1 20071227; DE 69937532 T2 20080904; JP 2000147148 A 20000526; JP 4435344 B2 20100317

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091020

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937532 P 20071227

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2007-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUBOIS, JEAN-PHILIPPE

2007-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERTHOUD, STEPHANE

2007-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUBOIS, GERALD

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050624

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI