Global Patent Index - EP 0999527 A2

EP 0999527 A2 2000-05-10 - Method and aparatus for counting coins

Title (en)

Method and aparatus for counting coins

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zählen von Münzen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour compter des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0999527 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250379 A

Priority

DE 19851971 A

Abstract (en)

Coins are transported in random sequence along a guideway and detected and counted by a scanning head. At least two types of coin (currency) are detected by an electronic detection module. The total value of the detected coins is calculated in one of the currencies by a microprocessor, and indicated on a display, printed out or transferred to a personal computer. An apparatus for counting coins is also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Zählen von Münzen, die in regelloser Folge mittels einer Transporteinrichtung entlang einer Führungsbahn gefördert und mittels eines der Führungsbahn zugeordneten Tastkopfes erkannt und gezählt werden. Um mehrere Münzensorten (Währungen) gleichzeitig verarbeiten zu können und am Ende der Verarbeitung den Gesamtwert aller Münzen der mindestens zwei Münzensorten ermitteln zu haben, sieht die Erfindung vor, daß mindestens zwei Münzensorten (Währungen) mittels eines elektronischen Erkennungsmoduls erkannt werden, das die erkannten Münzen den einzelnen Münzensorten zuordnet, und daß der Gesamtwert der erkannten Münzen mittels eines angeschlossenen Mikroprozessors in einer der Währungen berechnet und auf einem Display dargestellt bzw. mittels eines Druckers ausgedruckt oder über eine Schnittstelle an einen Personalcomputer übertragen wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 3/00 (2006.01); G07D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 3/16 (2013.01); G07D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0363946 B1 19920415

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999527 A2 20000510; EP 0999527 A3 20020227; DE 19851971 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080327

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB

2002-11-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20020220;SI PAYMENT 20020220

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 9/04 A, 7G 07D 3/16 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI