Global Patent Index - EP 0999567 A1

EP 0999567 A1 2000-05-10 - Gear transmission for switches having at least one switching stage

Title (en)

Gear transmission for switches having at least one switching stage

Title (de)

Schaltergetriebe mit wenigstens einer Schaltstufe

Title (fr)

Transmission par engrenage pour interrupteurs comprenant au moins un étage de commutation

Publication

EP 0999567 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120923 A

Priority

EP 98120923 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism includes a cam plate (15) for actuating switching elements in a switching stage. The cam plate comprises internal toothing (16) having the same reference diameter as the internal toothing (14) of an internal geared wheel (13). The internal toothing of the cam plate has a different number of teeth than the internal geared wheel. The cam disc meshes via the internal toothing with at least one planetary wheel of a switching stage (4).

Abstract (de)

Ein Schaltergetriebe mit wenigstens zwei Getriebestufen, von denen wenigstens eine Getriebestufe als Schaltstufe gestaltet ist, wobei die wenigstens eine Schaltstufe durch ein auf einer Antriebswelle koaxial drehfestes Sonnenrad, durch einen wenigstens ein Planetenrad tragenden Planetenträger und durch ein mit dem wenigstens einen Planetenrad innenseitig kämmendes Hohlrad gebildet ist, das gehäusefest gehalten ist, sowie mit einer Nockenscheibe zur Betätigung von Schaltelementen, ist bekannt. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Nockenscheibe mit einer Innenverzahnung versehen, die etwa den gleichen Teilkreisdurchmesser aufweist wie die Innenverzahnung des Hohlrades, wobei die Innenverzahnung der Nockenscheibe eine zu der Innenverzahnung des Hohlrades unterschiedliche Zähnezahl aufweist, und wobei die Nockenscheibe mittels der Innenverzahnung mit dem wenigstens einen Planetenzahnrad der Schaltstufe kämmt. Einsatz für Endschalter von Kränen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/40; H01H 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/40 (2006.01); H01H 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/40 (2013.01); H01H 19/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999567 A1 20000510; EP 0999567 B1 20050216; AT 289448 T 20050315; DE 59812577 D1 20050324; US 6244984 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GKN STROMAG AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59812577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59812577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59812577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STROMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: GEAR TRANSMISSION FOR SWITCHES HAVING AT LEAST ONE SWITCHING STAGE

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI