Global Patent Index - EP 0999571 A2

EP 0999571 A2 2000-05-10 - Mounting means for a mask frame

Title (en)

Mounting means for a mask frame

Title (de)

Aufhängungselement für einen Lochmasken-Rahmen

Title (fr)

Elément de suspension d'un cadre de masque perforé

Publication

EP 0999571 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00103229 A

Priority

  • EP 97401086 A
  • FR 9606366 A

Abstract (en)

Device for fixing the element on the frame wall comprises: upright (56) attached to plate having at least 2 locking tabs (60a, 60b) on the side of the frame (61) wall (62); spring (57) projecting on to an internal face of upright (56) coming into contact with the frame wall; and at least one strip (59a, 59b) comprising fixing bar (59'a, 59'b) at its end to attach the element on frame by clipping. The fixing bars (59'a, 59'b) of the strip (59a, 59b) are engaged on an element for retention of the frame (61) and the spring (57) compressed between the upright (56) and the wall (62) of the frame (61). The suspension element consists of a thin metal strip cut out and bent.

Abstract (fr)

L'élément de suspension comporte une plaquette (58) traversée par une ouverture (64) d'engagement de l'élément de suspension (55) sur un pion (65) solidaire de la dalle du tube à rayons cathodiques et des moyens de fixation de l'élément de suspension (55) sur une paroi (62) du cadre (61). Les moyens de fixation de l'élément de suspension (55) comportent un montant (56) solidaire de la plaquette (58) ayant au moins une patte d'accrochage (60a, 60b) sur un bord de la paroi (62) du cadre (61), un ressort (57) en saillie sur une face interne du montant (56) venant en contact avec la paroi (62) du cadre (61) et au moins une languette (59a, 59b) comportant un ergot d'accrochage (59'a, 59'b) à son extrémité pour réaliser la fixation de l'élément de suspension (55) sur le cadre (61) par clipsage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/82; H01J 29/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/14 (2006.01); H01J 9/46 (2006.01); H01J 29/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/073 (2013.01); H01J 2229/0705 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0809272 A1 19971126; EP 0809272 B1 20030502; AT 239301 T 20030515; BR 9709344 A 19990810; CA 2255568 A1 19971127; CN 1088907 C 20020807; CN 1169585 A 19980107; DE 69721375 D1 20030605; DE 69721375 T2 20040325; EP 0999571 A2 20000510; EP 0999571 A3 20020102; FR 2749104 A1 19971128; FR 2749104 B1 19980828; HU 9902464 A2 19991129; HU 9902464 A3 20020228; JP 2000509550 A 20000725; JP 3704545 B2 20051012; KR 100449785 B1 20041203; PL 330077 A1 19990426; RU 2184405 C2 20020627; TW 428195 B 20010401; US 5898259 A 19990427; WO 9744806 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080910

2008-03-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01J 29/07 A

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 809272

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT