Global patent index - EP 0999650 A2

EP 0999650 A2 2000-05-10 - Broadcast receiver for RDS and method of influencing the sound characteristics of the received audio signal in a broadcast receiver

Title (en)

Broadcast receiver for RDS and method of influencing the sound characteristics of the received audio signal in a broadcast receiver

Title (de)

Rundfunkempfänger zum Empfang von Radio-Daten und Verfahren zur Beeinflussung einer Klangcharakteristik eines wiederzugebenden Audiosignals in einem Rundfunkempfänger

Title (fr)

Récepteur de radiodiffusion RDS , et procedé pour influencer la caracteristique des signaux audio dans un récepteur de radiodiffusion

Publication

EP 0999650 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118297 A

Priority

DE 19848491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848491A1] An equalizer or digital signal processor (40) controls the sound characteristic of an audio signal. A control unit (15) allocates a prescribed sound characteristic to a transferred program type identification adjusted by a radio data system at the receiving section (20). The program type identification indicating various types of program contents is stored in a memory (80). The receiving section (20) receives and demodulates the radio transmitting frequency. A decoder (30) decodes the radio data transmitted with the radio program over the received radio transmitting frequency. The program type identification indicating the type of program contents transferred precisely over currently received radio transmitting frequency is stored in storage locations (62,64,66,68) assigned for each locations (72,74,76,78) in memory (80). An Independent claim is also included for audio signal sound characteristic controlling method.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Rundfunkempfänger 10 zum Empfang von Radio-Daten, insbesondere ein RDS-Rundfunkempfänger, sowie ein Verfahren zur Beeinflussung einer Klangcharakteristik eines wiederzugebenden Audio-Signals in einem Rundfunkempfänger vorgeschlagen, bei denen in einem Speicher 80 abgelegte Klangcharakteristiken V1, V2, ... Vm für wiederzugebende Audiosignale in Abhängigkeit einer über eine aktuell am Rundfunkempfänger eingestellte Rundfunksendefrequenz übertragenen Programmartkennung PTY einer Klangbeeinflussungseinrichtung 40 zugewiesen werden, so daß eine automatische Anpassung der Klangcharakteristik eines wiederzugebenden Audio-Signals an die Programmart des über die eingestellte Rundfunksendefrequenz übertragenen Programms ermöglicht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/16; H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03G 3/00 (2006.01); H03G 5/00 (2006.01); H03G 5/16 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 60/13 (2008.01); H04H 60/47 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/13 (2013.01); H04H 60/47 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848491 A1 20000427; EP 0999650 A2 20000510; EP 0999650 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04B 1/16 A, 7H 04H 1/00 B, 7H 03G 5/00 B, 7H 03G 3/00 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI