Global Patent Index - EP 0999650 A3

EP 0999650 A3 2001-12-19 - Broadcast receiver for RDS and method of influencing the sound characteristics of the received audio signal in a broadcast receiver

Title (en)

Broadcast receiver for RDS and method of influencing the sound characteristics of the received audio signal in a broadcast receiver

Title (de)

Rundfunkempfänger zum Empfang von Radio-Daten und Verfahren zur Beeinflussung einer Klangcharakteristik eines wiederzugebenden Audiosignals in einem Rundfunkempfänger

Title (fr)

Récepteur de radiodiffusion RDS , et procedé pour influencer la caracteristique des signaux audio dans un récepteur de radiodiffusion

Publication

EP 0999650 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118297 A

Priority

DE 19848491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848491A1] An equalizer or digital signal processor (40) controls the sound characteristic of an audio signal. A control unit (15) allocates a prescribed sound characteristic to a transferred program type identification adjusted by a radio data system at the receiving section (20). The program type identification indicating various types of program contents is stored in a memory (80). The receiving section (20) receives and demodulates the radio transmitting frequency. A decoder (30) decodes the radio data transmitted with the radio program over the received radio transmitting frequency. The program type identification indicating the type of program contents transferred precisely over currently received radio transmitting frequency is stored in storage locations (62,64,66,68) assigned for each locations (72,74,76,78) in memory (80). An Independent claim is also included for audio signal sound characteristic controlling method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/16; H03G 3/00; H03G 5/00; H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03G 3/00 (2006.01); H03G 5/00 (2006.01); H03G 5/16 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 60/13 (2008.01); H04H 60/47 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/13 (2013.01); H04H 60/47 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848491 A1 20000427; EP 0999650 A2 20000510; EP 0999650 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04B 1/16 A, 7H 04H 1/00 B, 7H 03G 5/00 B, 7H 03G 3/00 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI