Global Patent Index - EP 0999665 A2

EP 0999665 A2 2000-05-10 - Receiver for receiving digital coded messages

Title (en)

Receiver for receiving digital coded messages

Title (de)

Empfänger für den Empfang von digital codierten Meldungen

Title (fr)

Récepteur pour la réception de messages numériques codés

Publication

EP 0999665 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115343 A

Priority

DE 19850548 A

Abstract (en)

Data for the selection are supplied via a mobile data carrier such as a chip card. The data relate to a planned route of a motor vehicle. One of several data sets representing a route or area are stored on the data carrier can be selected. The data are based on a local database used for coding and decoding messages. The data may also include details about directions. A device for providing data on a mobile data carrier for selecting digitally encoded messages is also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Empfänger für digital codierte Meldungen mit einer Selektionseinrichtung für die empfangenen Meldungen nach geografischen Kriterien sind Daten für die Selektion über einen mobilen Datenträger zuführbar. Bei einer Einrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Daten auf einem mobilen Datenträger zur Selektion von digital codierten Meldungen nach geografischen Kriterien ist eine Einrichtung zur elektronischen Datenverarbeitung mit einer Einrichtung zur Aufzeichnung von Daten auf dem mobilen Datenträger versehen und weist ein Programm auf, das aus eingegebenen geografischen Informationen Daten für die Selektion erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 60/49 (2008.01); H04H 60/98 (2008.01); H04H 60/65 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/49 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 60/98 (2013.01); H04H 60/65 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850548 A1 20000504; EP 0999665 A2 20000510; EP 0999665 A3 20050413

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080318

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071106

2006-01-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-12-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 A

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/09 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI