Global Patent Index - EP 0999761 A1

EP 0999761 A1 2000-05-17 - DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A ROD IN THE TOBACCO PROCESSING INDUSTRY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A ROD IN THE TOBACCO PROCESSING INDUSTRY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN EINES STRANGES DER TABAKVERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT D'UN BOUDIN DANS L'INDUSTRIE DE TRANSFORMATION DU TABAC

Publication

EP 0999761 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941405 A

Priority

  • DE 19733443 A
  • EP 9804617 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19733443A1] The invention relates to a device for transporting a rod of the type produced in the tobacco processing industry, with a guiding element for the rod conveyor belt (6), said belt running on the base of an open channel. The aim of the invention is to improve a device of this type which is conceived especially for conveying a rod made up of cut tobacco in such a way as to make the guiding element of the rod conveyor belt resistant to wear and easy to influence in terms of flow conditions. To this end, the guiding element is provided with individual elements (4) which are adjacent to each other and which are arranged in a support (1). Since a number of relatively small individual elements are used, these elements can be configured to be economical but very wear-resistant. The individual elements can consist of a hard metal, a ceramic or similar. The flow conditions can also be modified quickly and economically by changing the individual elements in order to adapt to different tobacco material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/1807 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905924A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733443 A1 19990204; AT 232050 T 20030215; AT 317648 T 20060315; CN 1112859 C 20030702; CN 1265567 A 20000906; DE 59813382 D1 20060420; EP 0999761 A1 20000517; EP 0999761 B1 20030205; EP 1281329 A2 20030205; EP 1281329 A3 20040324; EP 1281329 B1 20060215; ES 2190099 T3 20030716; ES 2256374 T3 20060716; JP 2001511367 A 20010814; JP 4093718 B2 20080604; PL 187359 B1 20040630; PL 338351 A1 20001023; US 6186315 B1 20010213; WO 9905924 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050726

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190099 T3

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807128 P 20030313

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL