Global Patent Index - EP 0999764 A1

EP 0999764 A1 2000-05-17 - SHOE

Title (en)

SHOE

Title (de)

SCHUH

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE

Publication

EP 0999764 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940126 A

Priority

  • DE 29712596 U
  • DE 29720627 U
  • EP 9804116 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6341432B1] A shoe includes a sole (2) that extends from a rear heel area (6) through a metatarsal area (7) to a front ball or toe area (8), the sole being composed of a sole body (10) and a sole covering (11) formed on the underside of the sole body (10) and a recess (13) extending approximately from metatarsal area (7) to heel area (6). The recess is provided between sole body (10) and sole covering (11), with the area of sole covering (11) associated with recess (13) forming a pivoting element (18) designed to pivot around a pivot axis (20) located in the end area of recess (13) facing metatarsal area (7). The end area of recess (13) facing metatarsal area (7) is defined by a tip (13a) of recess (13), and the pivot axis (20) is located in the area between a lengthwise center of shoe (1) and heel area (6), with heel area (6) extending over approximately one-third of the length of shoe (1). At least one material element (25) is located in recess (13), the material element (25) being made of a flexible, soft material and being made approximately wedge-shaped or approximately in the shape of a circular section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 21/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 21/28 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01); A43B 13/18 (2006.01); A43B 21/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/188 (2013.01); A43B 13/10 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 13/145 (2013.01); A43B 13/148 (2013.01); A43B 21/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903368A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6341432 B1 20020129; AT 239399 T 20030515; CA 2294643 A1 19990128; CA 2294643 C 20070918; DK 0999764 T3 20030825; EP 0999764 A1 20000517; EP 0999764 B1 20030507; ES 2194340 T3 20031116; JP 2002508694 A 20020319; JP 3753745 B2 20060308; NO 20000074 A 20000316; NO 20000074 D0 20000107; NO 317521 B1 20041108; PT 999764 E 20030829; WO 9903368 A1 19990128; WO 9903368 A9 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: MASAI INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD., SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 239399

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131120

2013-12-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131128 AND 20131204

2013-10-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MASAI INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD., SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59808288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-10-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFSTETTER, SCHURACK & PARTNER PATENT- UND REC, DE

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-09-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFSTETTER, SCHURACK & PARTNER PATENT- UND REC, DE

2013-08-26 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MASAI INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20130813

2013-08-14 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20130806

2013-07-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MASAI INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD., SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MASAI INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD., SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-07-15 [REG CH PVPA] CANCELLATION OF PLEDGING

- Ref Legal Event Code: PVPA

2013-06-17 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MASAI INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD., SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130103

2013-01-11 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: NF4A

- Free Format Text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20130103

2008-06-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2008-06-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-05-15 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

- Ref Legal Event Code: PVP

2008-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MASAI MARKETING & TRADING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2008-01-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-12-13 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: MASAI MARKETING & TRADING AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD4A

- Effective date: 20071204

2007-12-13 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Owner name: MASAI MARKETING & TRADING AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: TE4A

- Effective date: 20071204

2007-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2007-06-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MASAI MARKETING & TRADING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-04-30 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

- Ref Legal Event Code: PVP

2006-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: INDUSTRIEBERATUNG MAIER AG

2006-05-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PK

- Free Format Text: DIE VERTRETERADRESSE WURDE BERICHTIGT

2006-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: INDUSTRIEBERATUNG MAIER AG

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2194340

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030402025

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SUSI PRYDE-HAENI BSC

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010720

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE