Global Patent Index - EP 0999765 A1

EP 0999765 A1 2000-05-17 - UNFOLDING CLASP FOR WRIST BAND

Title (en)

UNFOLDING CLASP FOR WRIST BAND

Title (de)

FALTVERSCHLUSS FÜR ARMBÄNDER

Title (fr)

BOUCLE DEPLOYANTE POUR BRACELET

Publication

EP 0999765 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98931879 A

Priority

  • CH 9800315 W
  • CH 180197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905930A1] The invention concerns an unfolding wristband (4) clasp (1), comprising two side plates (10) articulated with a central plate (11), for ensuring the wristband opening. The plates (10, 11) are made of a flexible material capable of matching the shape of the wearer's wrist. The deformation of the plates brought about by a force applied perpendicularly to the plane (x, z) containing the plates is greater than the deformation of the plates brought about by an identical force applied along any other direction. The plates are made of a composite material, for instance a metal brace (100, 110) covered with a flexible material (101, 111) such as rubber, plastic or leather.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 99/00 (2010.01); A44C 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3779 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905930A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905930 A1 19990211; AU 8204298 A 19990222; CA 2298976 A1 19990211; DE 69824416 D1 20040715; DE 69824416 T2 20050728; EP 0999765 A1 20000517; EP 0999765 B1 20040609; JP 2002505124 A 20020219; RU 2199253 C2 20030227; TW 574860 U 20040201; US 6289562 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TAG HEUER SA

- Free text: TAG HEUER SA#RUE LOUIS-JOSEPH-CHEVROLET 6A#2300 LA-CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- TAG HEUER SA#RUE LOUIS-JOSEPH-CHEVROLET 6A#2300 LA-CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH)

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1023925

2007-02-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA;RUE DES TERREAUX 7 CASE POSTALE 2848;2001 NEUCHATEL (CH)

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TAG HEUER SA

- Free text: TAG-HEUER S.A.#14A, AVENUE DES CHAMPS-MONTANTS#2074 MARIN-EPAGNIER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- TAG HEUER SA#RUE LOUIS-JOSEPH-CHEVROLET 6A#2300 LA-CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH)

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-12-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CHRISTOPHE SAAM PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824416 P 20040715

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAG-HEUER S.A.

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL