Global Patent Index - EP 0999766 A1

EP 0999766 A1 2000-05-17 - WATCH STRAP

Title (en)

WATCH STRAP

Title (de)

ARMBAND

Title (fr)

BRACELET

Publication

EP 0999766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939519 A

Priority

  • DE 19729903 A
  • EP 9803751 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19729903A1] The inventive watch strap has an end element (1) which is connected to another component in such a way that the end element is able to pivot around an axis, said axis being transversal to the longitudinal extension of the watch strap. Said end element (1) can also adjusted in relation to said other component in the direction of the longitudinal extension of the watch strap. The watch strap end element (1) is also linked to a pivot element (3) in such a way that the end element is able to pivot around an axis of adjustment (2), said axis of adjustment extending transversally to the longitudinal extension of the watch strap, approximately in the plane of the watch strap. Said pivot element (3) is connected to the other component in such a way that the pivot element is able to pivot approximately 180 DEG around a pivot axis (4), said pivot axis being parallel to the axis of adjustment (2). The pivot element (3) can be retained in its end pivot positions. The axis of adjustment (2) and pivot axis (4) are located approximately one behind the other in the direction in which the watch strap extends longitudinally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24; A44C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/14 (2006.01); A44C 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902061A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729903 A1 19990114; CN 1195434 C 20050406; CN 1263440 A 20000816; EP 0999766 A1 20000517; EP 0999766 B1 20020911; JP 2001509408 A 20010724; JP 4280408 B2 20090617; KR 100402536 B1 20031022; US 6401307 B1 20020611; WO 9902061 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150619

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150619

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150619

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805532

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-08-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-01-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805532

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-17

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI