Global Patent Index - EP 0999767 A1

EP 0999767 A1 2000-05-17 - CONTAINER FOR STORING CONTACT LENSES

Title (en)

CONTAINER FOR STORING CONTACT LENSES

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER ZUM AUFBEWAHREN VON KONTAKTLINSEN

Title (fr)

CONTENANTS DESTINES A CONSERVER DES LENTILLES DE CONTACT

Publication

EP 0999767 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942604 A

Priority

  • AT 47897 U
  • AT 61597 U
  • EP 9804623 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905932A1] The invention relates to a container for storing contact lenses (6). The inventive container can be filled a liquid (2) for wetting the contact lenses (6), and consists of a bottom container part (1) and a top container part (8). Said top container part can be closed on the bottom container part (1) in such a way that the container is water-tight. A receiving part (5) for receiving the contact lenses (6) is located in the bottom container part (1). A lid part (10) which is provided in the top container part (8) interacts with the receiving part (5) in the bottom container part (1) when the container is closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/04 (2006.01); A45C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905932A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905932 A1 19990211; AT 206022 T 20011015; DE 59801584 D1 20011031; DK 0999767 T3 20011119; EP 0999767 A1 20000517; EP 0999767 B1 20010926; ES 2165189 T3 20020301; JP 2001511378 A 20010814; US 6286666 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050723

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-08-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040727

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: STEFAN *UMDASCH DESIGN K.G.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165189 T3

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2001-11-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801584 20011031

2001-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206022 T 20011015

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE