Global Patent Index - EP 0999769 B1

EP 0999769 B1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR MAKING A VARIABLE GEOMETRY AND HARDNESS MATTRESS, AND THE MATTRESS MADE THEREBY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A VARIABLE GEOMETRY AND HARDNESS MATTRESS, AND THE MATTRESS MADE THEREBY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERSTELLBAREN MATRATZE, UND DADURCH HERGESTELLTE MATRATZE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MATELAS A GEOMETRIE ET DURETE VARIABLES ET MATELAS AINSI FABRIQUE

Publication

EP 0999769 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937767 A

Priority

  • IT 9800216 W
  • IT MI971816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905940A2] A method for making a variable geometry and hardness mattress comprises the steps of providing a microcellular foamed material element and providing, by cross cutting the microcellular foamed material element, a plurality of throughgoing holes, in which a corresponding plurality of variable configuration supporting compensating elements, of variable configuration, are engaged. By this method a variable geometry and hardness mattress is provided, comprising a microcellular foamed material padding, including a plurality of variable configuration supporting compensating elements, engaged in throughgoing holes passing through the mattress padding, transversely of said padding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/20 (2013.01); A47C 27/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905940 A2 19990211; WO 9905940 A3 19990422; DE 69800702 D1 20010517; DE 69800702 T2 20010802; EP 0999769 A2 20000517; EP 0999769 B1 20010411; ES 2158688 T3 20010901; IT 1293503 B1 19990301; IT MI971816 A1 19990129

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040730

2005-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158688 T3

2001-07-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800702 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI PT

2001-04-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI PT