Global Patent Index - EP 0999855 A1

EP 0999855 A1 2000-05-17 - POLYMER BASED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TARGETED DELIVERY OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AGENTS

Title (en)

POLYMER BASED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TARGETED DELIVERY OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AGENTS

Title (de)

ARZNEIZUBEREITUNGEN AUF POLYMERBASIS ZUR GEZIELTEN ABGABE BIOLOGISCH AKTIVER WIRKSTOFFE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE DE POLYMERES DESTINEES A UNE ADMINISTRATION CIBLEE D'AGENTS BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIFS

Publication

EP 0999855 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937127 A

Priority

  • US 9815457 W
  • US 5372997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904824A1] This invention provides a polymeric construct for delivering a biologically active agent to a mammal comprising a first polymeric matrix, a biologically active agent contained within the polymeric matrix, and a second polymer chemically bound to the biologically active agent, said second polymer comprising an amino acid copolymer, said second polymer present in an amount effective to reduce leakage of the active agent from the polymeric construct prior to delivery to the desired situs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/48; A61K 31/00; A61K 47/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/197 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/4045 (2006.01); A61K 31/417 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/197 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/4045 (2013.01); A61K 31/417 (2013.01); A61K 47/32 (2013.01); A61K 47/34 (2013.01); A61K 47/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904824A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904824 A1 19990204; AU 8591298 A 19990216; CA 2297025 A1 19990204; CN 1264310 A 20000823; EP 0999855 A1 20000517; JP 2001510811 A 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 47/48 A, 7A 61K 47/42 B, 7A 61K 31/00 B, 7A 61P 3/10 B

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 47/48 A, 7A 61K 47/42 B, 7A 61K 31/00 B, 7A 61P 3/10 B

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT