Global Patent Index - EP 0999880 A1

EP 0999880 A1 2000-05-17 - EXERCISING IMPLEMENT FOR PERFORMING MUSCULAR STRETCHING EXERCISES AND RESPIRATION EXERCISES

Title (en)

EXERCISING IMPLEMENT FOR PERFORMING MUSCULAR STRETCHING EXERCISES AND RESPIRATION EXERCISES

Title (de)

TRAININGSGERÄT FÜR ATMUNGS- UND STRECKÜBUNGEN DER MUSKULATUR

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'EXERCICE PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER DES EXERCICES D'ETIREMENT MUSCULAIRE ET RESPIRATOIRES

Publication

EP 0999880 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937766 A

Priority

  • IT 9800215 W
  • IT MI971866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906120A1] The present invention relates to an improved exercises implement for performing muscular stretching exercises and respiration exercises, of the type comprising a bench provided with coupling rods and floor resting bars, including a back and a bottom portion, provided for defining a seating region and a support for a user legs. The back and bottom portion are pivoted, at their adjoining sides, to said floor bearing bars, in order to controllably turn about a horizontal rotary axis, to change the opening angle of the back with respect to the bottom portion as well as to change the slanting of the back and bottom portion with respect to the floor. The implement comprises moreover safety means, each including a spring and a control lever, for preventing the back and bottom portion from turning about said rotary axis, and including sliding rods which can be gripped by the user in order to perform stretching exercises on the muscles pertaining to the rear muscular chain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/4029 (2015.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906120A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906120 A1 19990211; AT 238084 T 20030515; AU 8645898 A 19990222; DE 69813824 D1 20030528; DE 69813824 T2 20040226; EP 0999880 A1 20000517; EP 0999880 B1 20030423; ES 2198737 T3 20040201; IT 1293809 B1 19990310; IT MI971866 A1 19990201

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: POSTURALMED SA, CH

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-03-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170223 AND 20170303

2017-02-09 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: POSTURALMED SA

- Effective date: 20170203

2017-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: POSTURALMED SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: K-POST LLC, US

2017-01-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POSTURALMED SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: K-POST LLC, NEW YORK, N.Y., US

- Document: DE 69813824

2017-01-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69813824

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: K-POST LLC

- Free text: K-POST LLC#875 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS SUITE 501#NEW YORK - NY 10001 (US) -TRANSFER TO- K-POST LLC#875 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS SUITE 501#NEW YORK - NY 10001 (US)

2010-08-31 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100729 AND 20100804

2010-07-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: K-POST LLC

- Free text: RAGGI, DANIELE#VIA GIOVIO, 13#22070 MONTANO LUCINO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- K-POST LLC#875 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS SUITE 501#NEW YORK - NY 10001 (US)

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198737 T3

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813824 P 20030528

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI PT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI PT