Global Patent Index - EP 0999881 A1

EP 0999881 A1 2000-05-17 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING OR SUPPORTING THE BODY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROTECTING OR SUPPORTING THE BODY

Title (de)

KÖRPERSCHUTZ-/STÜTZ-EINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CORPORELLE ET/OU SERVANT D'ATTELLE

Publication

EP 0999881 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946242 A

Priority

  • DE 9802103 W
  • DE 19732610 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732610A1] The invention relates to a device for protecting or supporting the body. The inventive device can be arranged on one part of the body and comprises a shaped body filling consisting of individual shaped bodies in a receiving envelope (11). The receiving envelope (11) is arranged in an outer section (13) substantially opposite to part of the body and relatively rigid in relation to an inner section (12) substantially facing part of the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/08; A61F 5/058

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/08 (2006.01); A61G 7/057 (2006.01); A63B 71/10 (2006.01); A63B 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/00 (2013.01); A63B 71/08 (2013.01); A61G 7/05753 (2013.01); A63B 71/10 (2013.01); A63B 71/1225 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1258 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732610 A1 19990225; AT 228874 T 20021215; EP 0999881 A1 20000517; EP 0999881 B1 20021204; US 6397400 B1 20020604; WO 9906126 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130727

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OPED G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030731

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HASSLER ANDREAS

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030727

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806552 20030116

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228874 T 20021215

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOERGER, HERBERT, DR.

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HASSLER, ANDREAS

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPED GMBH

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HASSLER, ANDREAS

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OPED GMBH

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HASSLER, ANDREAS

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL