Global patent index - EP 0999890 A1

EP 0999890 A1 2000-05-17 - METHOD FOR PREPARING CONCENTRATED AND EMULSIONS CALIBRATED IN A HIGHLY VISCOUS PHASE, IN PARTICULAR BITUMEN EMULSIONS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING CONCENTRATED AND EMULSIONS CALIBRATED IN A HIGHLY VISCOUS PHASE, IN PARTICULAR BITUMEN EMULSIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VORBEREITEN VON KONZENTRIERTEN UND KALIBRIERTEN EMULSIONEN BZW. EMULSIONEN AUS BITUMEN IN EINE PHASE VON ERHÖHTER VISKOSITÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PREPARER DES EMULSIONS CONCENTREES ET CALIBREES EN UNE PHASE DE VISCOSITE ELEVEE DONT DES EMULSIONS DE BITUMES

Publication

EP 0999890 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941475 A

Priority

  • FR 9801674 W
  • FR 9709654 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766736A1] The invention concerns a method useful for emulsifying a first hydrophobic or hydrophilic phase with viscosity between 1 and 5000 Pa's or higher with a second phase non-miscible with the first phase and in particular concentrated bitumen emulsions. The invention also concerns the resulting emulsions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/10 (2006.01); B01F 17/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/10 (2013.01); Y10S 516/928 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906139A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766736 A1 19990205; FR 2766736 B1 19991022; AU 751953 B2 20020905; AU 8983898 A 19990222; CA 2299164 A1 19990211; CA 2299164 C 20071002; DE 69811903 D1 20030410; DE 69811903 T2 20040205; EP 0999890 A1 20000517; EP 0999890 B1 20030305; ES 2192786 T3 20031016; US 6602917 B1 20030805; WO 9906139 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2192786

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69811903

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT