Global Patent Index - EP 0999922 A1

EP 0999922 A1 2000-05-17 - PERCUSSION AND/OR DRILL HAMMER WITH OSCILLATION DAMPING

Title (en)

PERCUSSION AND/OR DRILL HAMMER WITH OSCILLATION DAMPING

Title (de)

AUFBRUCH- UND / ODER BOHRHAMMER MIT SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNG

Title (fr)

MARTEAU PIQUEUR ET/OU PERFORATEUR AVEC SYSTEME AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS

Publication

EP 0999922 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939528 A

Priority

  • DE 19730356 A
  • EP 9803870 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730356A1] The inventive percussion and/or drill hammer (10) consists essentially of a hammer housing (12) which surrounds a rotor for a percussive tool (11), including the drive mechanism and the holding element, and an outer shell (14) which encompasses the hammer housing (12) at a distance. Said outer shell (14) is connected elastically to the hammer housing (12) at selected coupling points and is connected to a first handle (16) at the end facing away from the percussive tool (11) in the direction of impact of said percussive tool (11). The outer shell (14) extends as far as or at least almost as far as the percussive tool (11) where it is provided or can be provided with a second handle (17), said percussive tool projecting out of the hammer housing (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 16/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/11 (2006.01); B25D 17/24 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/24 (2013.01); B25F 5/006 (2013.01); B25D 2250/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730356 A1 19990128; DE 19730356 C2 20010517; EP 0999922 A1 20000517; EP 0999922 B1 20011024; ES 2163290 T3 20020116; JP 2001510099 A 20010731; US 6286610 B1 20010911; WO 9903647 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2003-02-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG TRANSFER- WACKER CONSTR

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020111

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163290 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801885 20011129

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-10-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010309

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE