Global Patent Index - EP 0999925 A1

EP 0999925 A1 2000-05-17 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WORKING SUBSTANTIALLY SHEET-OR LATH-SHAPED WORKPIECES, IN PARTICULAR MADE OF DERIVED TIMBER PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WORKING SUBSTANTIALLY SHEET-OR LATH-SHAPED WORKPIECES, IN PARTICULAR MADE OF DERIVED TIMBER PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEARBEITEN VON IM WESENTLICHEN FLÄCHIGEN ODER LEISTENFÖRMIGEN WERKSTÜCKEN, INSBESONDERE AUS HOLZWERKSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'USINAGE DE PIECES PRATIQUEMENT PLANES OU EN FORME DE BAGUETTES, EN PARTICULIER EN MATERIAUX DERIVES DU BOIS

Publication

EP 0999925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945103 A

Priority

  • DE 19732423 A
  • EP 9804715 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904944A1] The invention relates to a method and device for working at least one edge area of substantially sheet- or lath-shaped workpieces (2), in particular made of derived timber products or similar. The inventive method comprises the following steps: at least one substantially elongated edge profile (6) is produced on the workpiece (2); at least one heat-treatable material is applied to the edge profile (6); the heat-treatable material is smoothed. Immediately before or during application and/or smoothing of the heat-treatable material, the edge profile (6) is temporarily extended at one end (16, 16.2) at least. Application and/or smoothing of the heat-treatable material beings in front of or on the temporarily extended edge profile and/or ends on or behind the temporarily extended edge profile (6, 16.2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904944 A1 19990204; AU 9255498 A 19990216; DE 19732423 C1 19990304; EP 0999925 A1 20000517; EP 0999925 B1 20020306; ES 2174487 T3 20021101

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130728

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100729

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100728

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060728

2006-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060728

2005-07-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021209

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HOMAG MASCHINENBAU A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174487

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-06-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-06-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-11

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE