Global Patent Index - EP 0999933 A1

EP 0999933 A1 2000-05-17 - MAGNETIC-FIELD-ACUTATED INK JET NOZZLE

Title (en)

MAGNETIC-FIELD-ACUTATED INK JET NOZZLE

Title (de)

MAGNETFELD-BETÄTIGTE TINTENSTRAHLDÜSE

Title (fr)

BUSE DE JET D'ENCRE, ACTIONNE PAR UN CHAMP MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0999933 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933350 A

Priority

  • AU 9800548 W
  • AU PO806697 A
  • AU PO807297 A
  • AU PO807197 A
  • AU PO804797 A
  • AU PO803597 A
  • AU PO804497 A
  • AU PO806397 A
  • AU PO805697 A
  • AU PO806997 A
  • AU PO804997 A
  • AU PO803697 A
  • AU PO804897 A
  • AU PO807097 A
  • AU PO806797 A
  • AU PO800197 A
  • AU PO804197 A
  • AU PO800497 A
  • AU PO793597 A
  • AU PO793697 A
  • AU PO806197 A
  • AU PO805497 A
  • AU PO806597 A
  • AU PO805597 A
  • AU PO805397 A
  • AU PO793397 A
  • AU PO795097 A
  • AU PO794997 A
  • AU PO806097 A
  • AU PO805997 A
  • AU PO807397 A
  • AU PO807697 A
  • AU PO807597 A
  • AU PO807797 A
  • AU PO805897 A
  • AU PP398398 A
  • AU PP398298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903680A1] The ink jet printer ejection nozzle comprises a solenoid (11) which when operated, attracts the moveable plate (15) towards the fixed plate (13). This movement imparts momentum to the ink within the nozzle chamber (17). This momentum causes ejection of ink from the chamber. In addition there have been disclosed a large number of embodiments dealing with such items as: shutter means, linear stepper actuation, shape memory alloys, and methods of manufacturing a semiconductor wafer for use in an ink jet printer nozzle. The description includes 130 pages of description and 347 figures, and includes a summary of ink jet technology.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045; B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/13 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 3/42 (2006.01); B41J 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/445 (2013.01); B41J 2/14314 (2013.01); B41J 2/14427 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1628 (2013.01); B41J 2/1629 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/1635 (2013.01); B41J 2/1639 (2013.01); B41J 2/1642 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2/1645 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01); B41J 2/1648 (2013.01); B41J 2/17596 (2013.01); B41J 2002/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903680 A1 19990128; AT 289922 T 20050315; AT 352420 T 20070215; AT 352421 T 20070215; AT 352422 T 20070215; AT 352423 T 20070215; AT 353053 T 20070215; AT 355972 T 20070315; AT 381991 T 20080115; EP 0999933 A1 20000517; EP 0999933 A4 20001220; EP 0999933 B1 20050302; EP 1508443 A2 20050223; EP 1508443 A3 20050316; EP 1508443 B1 20070307; EP 1508444 A2 20050223; EP 1508444 A3 20050316; EP 1508444 B1 20071121; EP 1508445 A1 20050223; EP 1508445 B1 20070131; EP 1508446 A1 20050223; EP 1508446 B1 20070110; EP 1508448 A1 20050223; EP 1508448 B1 20070117; EP 1508449 A1 20050223; EP 1508449 B1 20070124; EP 1510339 A2 20050302; EP 1510339 A3 20050309; EP 1510339 B1 20070124; EP 1510340 A2 20050302; EP 1510340 A3 20050309; EP 1510340 B1 20070124; EP 1510341 A2 20050302; EP 1510341 A3 20050316; EP 1510341 B1 20070124; EP 1512535 A1 20050309; EP 1512535 B1 20071226; JP 2001510107 A 20010731; JP 2007062379 A 20070315; JP 2007062380 A 20070315; JP 2007062381 A 20070315; JP 2007062382 A 20070315; JP 2007062383 A 20070315; JP 4137964 B2 20080820; JP 4137965 B2 20080820; JP 4170582 B2 20081022; JP 4171037 B2 20081022; JP 4173174 B2 20081029; JP 4185538 B2 20081126

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140619 AND 20140625

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130715

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130715

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-04-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-04-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-08-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-07-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050715

2005-06-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-06-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829184 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-03-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MAGNETIC-FIELD-ACUTATED INK JET NOZZLE

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE