Global Patent Index - EP 0999934 A1

EP 0999934 A1 2000-05-17 - A THERMALLY ACTUATED INK JET

Title (en)

A THERMALLY ACTUATED INK JET

Title (de)

THERMISCH BETÄTIGTER TINTENSTRAHL

Title (fr)

JET D'ENCRE A COMMANDE THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0999934 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933352 A

Priority

  • AU 9800550 W
  • AU PO807897 A
  • AU PO793397 A
  • AU PO807597 A
  • AU PO807997 A
  • AU PO805097 A
  • AU PO805297 A
  • AU PO794897 A
  • AU PO795197 A
  • AU PO807497 A
  • AU PO794197 A
  • AU PO805197 A
  • AU PO804597 A
  • AU PO795297 A
  • AU PO804697 A
  • AU PO804297 A
  • AU PO804097 A
  • AU PO805797 A
  • AU PO805697 A
  • AU PO800197 A
  • AU PO803897 A
  • AU PO793797 A
  • AU PO800297 A
  • AU PO806897 A
  • AU PO806297 A
  • AU PO803497 A
  • AU PO803997 A
  • AU PO803797 A
  • AU PO804397 A
  • AU PO806497 A
  • AU PO794697 A
  • AU PO794397 A
  • AU PO800697 A
  • AU PO800797 A
  • AU PO800897 A
  • AU PO801097 A
  • AU PO794497 A
  • AU PO794797 A
  • AU PO794597 A
  • AU PO803397 A
  • AU PO801197 A
  • AU PO850397 A
  • AU PO939097 A
  • AU PO939397 A
  • AU PO939297 A
  • AU PO938997 A
  • AU PO939197 A
  • AU PP087397 A
  • AU PP089397 A
  • AU PP088897 A
  • AU PP089197 A
  • AU PP089097 A
  • AU PP089497 A
  • AU PP088997 A
  • AU PP087297 A
  • AU PP088297 A
  • AU PP087497 A
  • AU PP087597 A
  • AU PP089297 A
  • AU PP139898 A
  • AU PP139698 A
  • AU PP259398 A
  • AU PP259298 A
  • AU PP259198 A
  • AU PP399198 A
  • AU PP398398 A
  • AU PP398598 A
  • AU PP398998 A
  • AU PP398798 A
  • AU PP399098 A
  • AU PP398698 A
  • AU PP398498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903681A1] Ink jet printer ejection nozzle (2904) has ink drop (2915) ejected by motion (2914) of thermal actuator bending when heated by current flowing through it. 29 embodiments are disclosed where flaps, paddles or nozzle chamber walls are integrally or remotely actuated by thermal bending to produce an ink drop at the nozzle, or where thermal actuators move shutters to open nozzles allowing ink under cyclic pressure to form a drop, or where a thermal actuator unlatches a magnetic flap allowing it to move by magnetic pulse to produce an ink drop. The thermal bend actuators comprise multi-layer metals or metals layered with or embedded in high coefficient of thermal expansion materials. Methods of manufacturing arrangements or arrays of these nozzles as micro electromechanical systems using planar monolithic depositing, lithographic and etching processes are disclosed. Includes 195 pages of description and 681 figures, including 47 page summary of ink jet technology.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045; B41J 2/055; B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16; B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/19 (2006.01); B41J 3/42 (2006.01); B41J 3/44 (2006.01); H01H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/445 (2013.01); B41J 2/14314 (2013.01); B41J 2/14427 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1628 (2013.01); B41J 2/1629 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/1635 (2013.01); B41J 2/1639 (2013.01); B41J 2/1642 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2/1645 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01); B41J 2/1648 (2013.01); B41J 2/17596 (2013.01); B41J 2002/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903681 A1 19990128; AT 358019 T 20070415; AT 359915 T 20070515; AT 386638 T 20080315; AT 409119 T 20081015; EP 0999934 A1 20000517; EP 0999934 A4 20010627; EP 0999934 B1 20051026; EP 1637330 A1 20060322; EP 1637330 B1 20070418; EP 1640162 A1 20060329; EP 1640162 B1 20070328; EP 1650030 A1 20060426; EP 1650030 B1 20080924; EP 1650031 A1 20060426; EP 1650031 B1 20080220; ES 2302134 T3 20080701; JP 2003521389 A 20030715; JP 4160250 B2 20081001

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-04-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-04-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69832073

2015-02-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69832073

- Representative's name: K & H BONAPAT, DE

2015-02-04 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150127

2015-02-04 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150127

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141118

2014-12-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MEMJET TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, IE

- Effective date: 20141118

2014-12-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MEMJET TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, IE

- Effective date: 20141118

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MEMJET TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SILVERBROOK RESEARCH PTY. LTD., BALMAIN, NEW SOUTH WALES, AU

- Document: DE 69832073

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-11-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69832073

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-11-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69832073

- Representative's name: K & H BONAPAT, DE

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69832073

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2014-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140619 AND 20140625

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-02-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060206

2006-01-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060126

2006-01-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060126

2006-01-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-12-30 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: EIN PRIORITAETSAKTENZEICHEN WURDE BERICHTIGT:

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69832073 P 20051201

2005-11-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-06-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/045 A, 7B 41J 2/055 B, 7B 41J 2/14 B, 7B 41J 2/16 B, 7B 41J 2/165 B, 7B 41J 2/19 B, 7H 01H 1/00 B

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE