Global Patent Index - EP 0999986 A1

EP 0999986 A1 2000-05-17 - SEAL FOR SEALING AND RE-SEALING A BAG, AND BAG WITH SUCH SEAL

Title (en)

SEAL FOR SEALING AND RE-SEALING A BAG, AND BAG WITH SUCH SEAL

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN UND WIEDERVERSCHLIESSEN EINES BEUTELS SOWIE BEUTEL MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN VERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

FERMETURE POUR FERMER ET REFERMER UN SAC, ET SAC MUNI D'UNE TELLE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0999986 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945111 A

Priority

  • DE 19733294 A
  • EP 9804739 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19733294A1] The invention relates to a seal (10) for sealing and re-sealing a bag, in particular a bag for storing food e.g. bread, confectionery, pasta. The inventive seal comprises a strip (12) made of a plastic material which can be applied around the gathered neck (15) of the bag in such a way that the side (16) facing the bag of one end (20) of the strip (22) overlaps the outer side (22) of the other end (18), and is fixed in this position. The seal (10) can be closed again after opening. On opening for the first time, the structure of the strip (12) is modified in such a way that it is clear that the bag has been opened. The invention is characterized in that the strip is made of a thermoplastic plastic, and that the overlapping end (20) is welded to the underlying end (18) in such a way that a welding point is visible from the outside, and that, when first opened, an opening forms in the lifted end (20) at the welding point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 63/00; B65D 33/16; B65D 63/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/30 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 63/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/1616 (2013.01); B65D 63/1018 (2013.01); B65D 2101/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906298A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733294 A1 19990204; DE 19733294 C2 19990617; AT 215487 T 20020415; DK 0999986 T3 20020701; EP 0999986 A1 20000517; EP 0999986 B1 20020403; ES 2175775 T3 20021116; JP 2001515826 A 20010925; WO 9906298 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120730

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 215487 T

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *P + S MAKO VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110802

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175775 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-07-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803638 20020508

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215487 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE