Global Patent Index - EP 0999991 B1

EP 0999991 B1 2002-09-04 - WINDING METHOD, DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A WEB AND WEB WINDER

Title (en)

WINDING METHOD, DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A WEB AND WEB WINDER

Title (de)

WICKELVERFAHREN, BAHNTRENNVORRICHTUNG UND BAHNWICKLER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE BOBINAGE, DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION DE BANDE ET BOBINEUSE DE BANDE

Publication

EP 0999991 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929372 A

Priority

  • CH 182497 A
  • EP 9803067 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906313A1] According to the invention, the winding of a continuous material strip (B) on a series of reel spools (16, 26, 36) using a tape winder (11, 21, 31), at least a moveable return roller (18, 28, 38) and a separation device (10, 20, 30) is made possible due to the fact that the front end (E1) of the material strip (B), formed as a result of actuating the separation device, is brought into winding contact with the reel spool under the effect of an arc-shaped air flow (L) extending on at least one quarter approximately of the spool circumference, at least on virtually the whole width of the reel spool (16, 26, 36) and up to the vicinity of the contact line (K) between the tape winder (11, 21, 31) and the adjacent reel spool. The separation device (10, 20, 30) comprises a vacuum column (200, 300) extending on virtually the whole reel spool length and connected to a guiding wall (203, 303) surrounding like an arc the reel spool on at least one quarter of its circumference, as well as a serrated blade (201, 301) intended to bring into winding contact with the reel spool the front end (E1) of the material strip (B), formed as a result of actuating the separation device, under the effect of an arc-shaped air flow (L) extending on at least one quarter of the spool circumference, at least on virtually the whole width of the reel spool and up to the vicinity of the contact line (K) between the tape winder and the adjacent reel spool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22; B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/00 (2013.01); B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906313 A1 19990211; AT 223347 T 20020915; DE 59805441 D1 20021010; EP 0999991 A1 20000517; EP 0999991 B1 20020904; JP 2002509510 A 20020326; US 6305635 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223347 T

- Effective date: 20150525

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-12-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WINDMOELLER AND HOELSCHER, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WINDMOELLER AND HOELSCHER, DE

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805441

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805441

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WINDMOLLER & HOLSCHER

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805441 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223347 T 20020915

2002-05-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WINDING METHOD, DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A WEB AND WEB WINDER

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOOSER, GOTTLIEB

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 19/22 A, 7B 65H 19/26 B

2001-11-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WINDING METHOD, DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A TAPE AND TAPE WINDER

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE