Global Patent Index - EP 0999992 A1

EP 0999992 A1 2000-05-17 - PROCESS AND CROSS-WINDING DEVICE FOR LAYING A THREAD

Title (en)

PROCESS AND CROSS-WINDING DEVICE FOR LAYING A THREAD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND CHANGIEREINRICHTUNG ZUM VERLEGEN EINES FADENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF A VA-ET-VIENT POUR LA POSE D'UN FIL

Publication

EP 0999992 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943765 A

Priority

  • DE 19732222 A
  • EP 9804581 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905055A1] A process and cross-winding device (3) are disclosed for laying a thread (13). The traversing thread guide is moved by an electric motor (7) and the set position of the traversing thread guide is determined by the relative position of the stator and rotor of the electric motor. According to the invention, the real position of the traversing thread guide is continuously detected by measurement means (8, 10) and transmitted to controlling means (11) which compare the real and set positions of the traversing thread guide and generate a corresponding differential signal for controlling the relative position of the stator and rotor of the electric motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2821 (2013.01); B65H 54/2824 (2013.01); B65H 54/2881 (2013.01); B65H 54/2884 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905055A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905055 A1 19990204; CN 1112313 C 20030625; CN 1265077 A 20000830; EP 0999992 A1 20000517; EP 0999992 B1 20040128; JP 2001510769 A 20010807; JP 4155705 B2 20080924; TR 200000187 T2 20001121; TW 369506 B 19990911; US 6405966 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160722

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160722

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810677

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150803

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-04-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810677 P 20040304

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI