Global Patent Index - EP 1000004 A2

EP 1000004 A2 2000-05-17 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TETRABUTYL AMMONIUM PHENOLATE DIPHENOL ADDUCT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING TETRABUTYL AMMONIUM PHENOLATE DIPHENOL ADDUCT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TETRABUTYLAMMONIUMPHENOLAT-DIPHENOLADDUKT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN PRODUIT D'ADDITION DE DIPHENOLE DE TETRABUTYLAMMONIUMPHENATE

Publication

EP 1000004 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98939566 A

Priority

  • DE 19730022 A
  • EP 9803987 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730022A1] The invention relates to a method for producing and purifying tetrabutyl ammonium phenolate diphenol adduct by reacting an alkali phenolate with tetrabutyl ammonium salts in an aqueous phase and subsequently precipitating the adduct by adding phenol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/02 (2006.01); C07C 37/00 (2006.01); C07C 37/64 (2006.01); C07C 37/72 (2006.01); C07C 37/82 (2006.01); C07C 39/00 (2006.01); C07C 39/04 (2006.01); C07C 209/68 (2006.01); C07C 211/63 (2006.01); C08G 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/0239 (2013.01); C07C 37/055 (2013.01); C07C 37/64 (2013.01); C07C 37/72 (2013.01); C07C 37/82 (2013.01); C07C 209/68 (2013.01); Y02P 20/52 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 209/68 + C07C 211/63
  2. C07C 37/055 + C07C 39/04
  3. C07C 37/64 + C07C 39/235
  4. C07C 37/82 + C07C 39/04
  5. C07C 37/72 + C07C 39/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730022 A1 19990114; AU 8803198 A 19990208; CN 1107045 C 20030430; CN 1262668 A 20000809; DE 59805837 D1 20021107; EP 1000004 A2 20000517; EP 1000004 B1 20021002; ES 2184313 T3 20030401; HK 1029580 A1 20040109; IL 133482 D0 20010430; JP 2001509494 A 20010724; TW 409116 B 20001021; US 6177538 B1 20010123; WO 9902474 A2 19990121; WO 9902474 A3 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040701

2005-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040630

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAYER A.G.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-07-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030609

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184313 T3

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805837 20021107

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL