Global Patent Index - EP 1000012 A1

EP 1000012 A1 2000-05-17 - PROCESS FOR CONVERTING PROPARGYLIC AMINE-N-OXIDES TO ENAMINONES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CONVERTING PROPARGYLIC AMINE-N-OXIDES TO ENAMINONES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON AMIN-N-OXIDEN IN ENAMIONE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CONVERTIR DES AMINO-N-OXYDES PROPARGYLIQUES EN ENAMINONES

Publication

EP 1000012 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935990 A

Priority

  • US 9815391 W
  • US 90329997 A
  • US 10647198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906351A1] This invention concerns the use of a hydroxylic solvent in the preparation of enaminones from the corresponding amine N-oxides or propargylic amines via the general process outlined above (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 221/00; C07C 291/04; C07D 295/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/10 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 31/5517 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); B01J 27/122 (2006.01); B01J 31/22 (2006.01); B01J 31/24 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 221/00 (2006.01); C07C 225/14 (2006.01); C07C 225/16 (2006.01); C07C 229/38 (2006.01); C07C 269/06 (2006.01); C07C 271/28 (2006.01); C07C 291/04 (2006.01); C07D 207/273 (2006.01); C07D 231/12 (2006.01); C07D 295/104 (2006.01); C07D 309/30 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C07D 207/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/273 (2013.01); C07C 221/00 (2013.01); C07C 291/04 (2013.01); C07D 295/104 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 487/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 221/00 + C07C 225/14
  2. C07C 221/00 + C07C 225/16

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906351A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906351 A1 19990211; AR 013375 A1 20001227; AU 747543 B2 20020516; AU 8512198 A 19990222; CA 2298595 A1 19990211; EP 1000012 A1 20000517; JP 2001512095 A 20010821; TW 513394 B 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026199

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991222;LT PAYMENT 19991222;LV PAYMENT 19991222;MK PAYMENT 19991222;RO PAYMENT 19991222;SI PAYMENT 19991222