Global Patent Index - EP 1000017 A1

EP 1000017 A1 2000-05-17 - IL-8 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

IL-8 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

ANTAGONISTEN DES IL-8-REZEPTORS

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR IL-8

Publication

EP 1000017 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938138 A

Priority

  • US 9815830 W
  • US 5400197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906354A1] This invention relates to novel phenyl ureas useful in the treatment of disease states mediated by the chemokine, Interleukin-8 (IL-8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 241/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/216 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 275/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 275/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906354 A1 19990211; AU 8673198 A 19990222; CA 2294064 A1 19990211; EP 1000017 A1 20000517; EP 1000017 A4 20001018; JP 2001512096 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028232

2001-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07C 275/42 A, 7A 61K 31/17 B, 7C 07C 241/00 -

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000113