Global patent index - EP 1000089 A1

EP 1000089 A1 2000-05-17 - COLLAGEN TYPE I AND TYPE III ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

COLLAGEN TYPE I AND TYPE III ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON KOLLAGEN TYP I UND TYP III

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'ADHESIF A BASE DE COLLAGENE DU TYPE I ET DU TYPE III

Publication

EP 1000089 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938008 A

Priority

  • US 9815382 W
  • US 5387297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905180A1] Polymerized type I and/or III collagen based compositions for medical use as adhesives and sealants and preparation thereof are described. Prior to polymerization, the collagen monomers are prepared recombinantly whereby chemical modifications of the collagen are not needed to form such monomers. The type I and/or III collagen compositions are useful as medical adhesives for bonding soft tissues or in a sealant film for a variety of medical uses. In a further aspect of the present invention, the polymerized type I and/or III collagen composition includes agents which induce wound healing or provide for additional beneficial characteristics desired in a tissue adhesive and sealant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 2/46; C08F 2/48; C08H 1/00; C08J 3/28; C08L 89/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61L 24/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/78 (2006.01); C08F 2/46 (2006.01); C08F 2/48 (2006.01); C08H 1/00 (2006.01); C08L 89/00 (2006.01); C08L 89/06 (2006.01); C09J 189/00 (2006.01); C09J 189/06 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 24/102 (2013.01); C08L 89/06 (2013.01); C09J 189/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905180 A1 19990204; AU 8662798 A 19990216; CA 2308146 A1 19990204; CN 1272118 A 20001101; EP 1000089 A1 20000517; EP 1000089 A4 20010829; IL 134249 D0 20010430; JP 2001511431 A 20010814; NO 20000425 A 20000323; NO 20000425 D0 20000127

INPADOC legal status

2007-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025979

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040103

2002-03-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NEFF, THOMAS, B.

2002-03-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KIVIRIKKO, KARI, I.

2002-03-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POLAREK, JAMES W.

2001-08-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 08F 2/46 A, 7C 08F 2/48 B, 7C 08H 1/00 B, 7C 08J 3/28 B, 7C 08L 89/00 B, 7A 61L 25/00 B, 7C 07K 14/78 B

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000221

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE