Global Patent Index - EP 1000120 A1

EP 1000120 A1 2000-05-17 - Composition comprising a metallocene plastomer of density less than 0.900 g/cm3 and an ethylene/alkyl (meth)acrylate copolymer

Title (en)

Composition comprising a metallocene plastomer of density less than 0.900 g/cm3 and an ethylene/alkyl (meth)acrylate copolymer

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein Metallocen Plastomer mit Dichte niedriger als 0,900 g/cm3 und ein Ethylen-Alkyl(meth)acrylat Copolymerisat

Title (fr)

Composition comprenant un plastomère métallocène de densité inférieure à 0,900 g/cm3 et un copolymère éthylène/(méth)acrylate d'alkyle

Publication

EP 1000120 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941496 A

Priority

  • FR 9801695 W
  • FR 9709859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906483A1] The invention concerns a composition comprising a metallocene ethylene/alpha-olefin copolymer; and an ethylene/alkyl (meth)acrylate copolymer with their secant moduli ratio greater than 1. The invention also concerns films obtained from said composition, in particular an adhesive film capable of being drawn, and a high temperature extrusion method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/08 (2013.01); C08L 23/0815 (2013.01); C08L 23/0869 (2013.01); C08L 2314/06 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2839 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2861 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31909 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31913 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31928 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31935 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31938 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 23/08 + C08L 2666/04
  2. C08L 23/0815 + C08L 2666/04

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906482A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906483 A1 19990211; AT 225824 T 20021015; AU 8985398 A 19990222; AU 8985498 A 19990222; CA 2297810 A1 19990211; CA 2297811 A1 19990211; DE 69808636 D1 20021114; DE 69808636 T2 20030710; EP 0998527 A1 20000510; EP 0998527 B1 20021009; EP 1000120 A1 20000517; ES 2181261 T3 20030216; US 6509090 B1 20030121; US 6534173 B1 20030318; WO 9906482 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080910

2008-05-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITION COMPRISING A METALLOCENE PLASTOMER OF DENSITY LESS THAN 0.900 G/CM3 AND AN ETHYLENE/ALKYL (METH)ACRYLATE COPOLYMER

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKEMA FRANCE

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKEMA FRANCE

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKEMA

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOFINA

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE