Global patent index - EP 1000133 A1

EP 1000133 A1 2000-05-17 - USE OF ELECTROLYTE MIXTURES AS SEQUESTERING AGENTS

Title (en)

USE OF ELECTROLYTE MIXTURES AS SEQUESTERING AGENTS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ELEKTROLYTGEMISCHEN ALS SEQUESTRIERMITTEL

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE MELANGES ELECTROLYTIQUES COMME AGENTS SEQUESTRANTS

Publication

EP 1000133 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940230 A

Priority

  • DE 19731881 A
  • EP 9804398 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731881C1] Electrolyte mixture used as a sequestrant in the production of aqueous hypochlorite containing bleaches comprises (A) a lignin sulphonate; and (B) a further electrolyte salt that is a polyacrylate, phosphonate, silicate, carbonate or citrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/30; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/10; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/36; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/382; C11D 3/395; D06L 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/364 (2013.01); C11D 1/30 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/361 (2013.01); C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 3/3956 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905245A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731881 C1 19981022; EP 1000133 A1 20000517; EP 1000133 B1 20020424; ES 2175751 T3 20021116; HU 0004799 A2 20010428; HU 0004799 A3 20021128; PL 338248 A1 20001009; SK 942000 A3 20000711; WO 9905245 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160331

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175751

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JOSA, JAUME

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FABRY, BERND, DR.

2001-12-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000115

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT