Global patent index - EP 1000136 A1

EP 1000136 A1 2000-05-17 - CLEANING AGENT FOR HARD SURFACES, CONTAINING GLUCANASE

Title (en)

CLEANING AGENT FOR HARD SURFACES, CONTAINING GLUCANASE

Title (de)

GLUCANASEHALTIGES REINIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR HARTE OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PRODUIT DETERGENT CONTENANT DE LA GLUCANASE ET DESTINE AUX SURFACES DURES

Publication

EP 1000136 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943758 A

Priority

  • DE 19732750 A
  • EP 9804566 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732750A1] The invention relates to agents for cleaning hard surfaces, such as for cleaning crockery by machine in particular. The aim of the invention is to improve the cleaning quality of such agents in relation to polysaccharide stains. To this end, the inventive agent for cleaning hard surfaces, especially crockery, was developed. Said inventive cleaning agent contains a beta -glucanase as well as the usual constituents, said other constituents being compatible with this enzyme.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38636 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906515A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732750 A1 19990204; AT 231542 T 20030215; EP 1000136 A1 20000517; EP 1000136 B1 20030122; ES 2191330 T3 20030901; HU 0003055 A2 20010129; PL 338419 A1 20001106; US 6703357 B1 20040309; WO 9906515 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-06-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-06-15 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20041215

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20031021

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20031022

2004-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

2003-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191330

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-04-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807025

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE