Global Patent Index - EP 1000137 A1

EP 1000137 A1 2000-05-17 - DETERGENT CONTAINING GLUCANASE

Title (en)

DETERGENT CONTAINING GLUCANASE

Title (de)

GLUCANASEHALTIGES WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

LESSIVE CONTENANT DE LA GLUCANASE

Publication

EP 1000137 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943763 A

Priority

  • DE 19732749 A
  • EP 9804578 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732749A1] The aim of the invention is to develop a detergent with an improved capacity for cleaning polysaccharide stains which do not exist solely of starch. To this end, the invention uses a detergent suitable for washing textiles, containing a beta -glucanase in addition to usual constituents which are compatible with this enzyme.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38636 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906516A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732749 A1 19990204; AT 224943 T 20021015; CN 1299404 A 20010613; DK 1000137 T3 20030203; EP 1000137 A1 20000517; EP 1000137 B1 20020925; ES 2183415 T3 20030316; HU 0004797 A2 20010428; JP 2001512175 A 20010821; PL 338420 A1 20001106; US 6417152 B1 20020709; WO 9906516 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20050731

2007-11-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-11-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070524

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030625

2007-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20030625

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [REG GB 711G] CORRECTION ALLOWED (SECT. 117/1977)

2003-10-08 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

2003-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183415 T3

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805725 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224943 T 20021015

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE