Global Patent Index - EP 1000137 B1

EP 1000137 B1 2002-09-25 - DETERGENT CONTAINING GLUCANASE

Title (en)

DETERGENT CONTAINING GLUCANASE

Title (de)

GLUCANASEHALTIGES WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

LESSIVE CONTENANT DE LA GLUCANASE

Publication

EP 1000137 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943763 A

Priority

  • DE 19732749 A
  • EP 9804578 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732749A1] The aim of the invention is to develop a detergent with an improved capacity for cleaning polysaccharide stains which do not exist solely of starch. To this end, the invention uses a detergent suitable for washing textiles, containing a beta -glucanase in addition to usual constituents which are compatible with this enzyme.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38636 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732749 A1 19990204; AT 224943 T 20021015; CN 1299404 A 20010613; DK 1000137 T3 20030203; EP 1000137 A1 20000517; EP 1000137 B1 20020925; ES 2183415 T3 20030316; HU 0004797 A2 20010428; JP 2001512175 A 20010821; KR 20010022293 A 20010315; PL 338420 A1 20001106; US 6417152 B1 20020709; WO 9906516 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20050731

2007-11-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-11-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070524

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030625

2007-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20030625

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [REG GB 711G] CORRECTION ALLOWED (SECT. 117/1977)

2003-10-08 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

2003-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183415 T3

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805725 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224943 T 20021015

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE