Global Patent Index - EP 1000147 A2

EP 1000147 A2 2000-05-17 - 5' ESTs FOR SECRETED PROTEINS EXPRESSED IN TESTIS AND OTHER TISSUES

Title (en)

5' ESTs FOR SECRETED PROTEINS EXPRESSED IN TESTIS AND OTHER TISSUES

Title (de)

5' ESTS FÜR SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE, DIE IM HODEN UND ANDEREN GEWEBEN EXPRIMIERT WERDEN

Title (fr)

EST 5' POUR PROTEINES EXPRIMEES DANS LES TESTICULES ET AUTRES TISSUS

Publication

EP 1000147 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98936589 A

Priority

  • IB 9801231 W
  • US 90527997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906549A2] The sequences of 5' ESTs derived from mRNAs encoding secreted proteins are disclosed. The 5' ESTs may be to obtain cDNAs and genomic DNAs corresponding to the 5' ESTs. The 5' ESTs may also be used in diganostic, forensic, gene therapy, and chromosome mapping procedures. Upstream regulatory sequences may also be obtained using the 5' ESTs. The 5' ESTs may also be used to design expression vectors and secretion vectors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/10; C12N 15/66; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906549A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906549 A2 19990211; WO 9906549 A3 19990408; WO 9906549 B1 19990520; AT 495257 T 20110115; AU 8555098 A 19990222; CA 2297157 A1 19990211; CY 1111662 T1 20151007; DE 69842099 D1 20110224; DK 1378571 T3 20110404; EP 1000147 A2 20000517; EP 1378571 A1 20040107; EP 1378571 B1 20110112; ES 2359401 T3 20110523; JP 2001512012 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070323

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SERONO GENETICS INSTITUTE S.A.

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040510

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENSET

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE