Global Patent Index - EP 1000165 A1

EP 1000165 A1 2000-05-17 - SPECIAL VIRUS DNA FRAGMENTS AND THEIR USE AS PROMOTER

Title (en)

SPECIAL VIRUS DNA FRAGMENTS AND THEIR USE AS PROMOTER

Title (de)

SPEZIELLE VIRUS-DNA-FRAGMENTE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS PROMOTOR

Title (fr)

FRAGMENTS DE VIRUS ADN SPECIAUX ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PROMOTEURS

Publication

EP 1000165 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942544 A

Priority

  • DE 19730535 A
  • EP 9804346 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730535A1] The invention relates to the characterization and use of powerful viral promoters for expressing genes, especially in plants. The invention is based on the surprising discovery that special DNA fragments derived from CFDV-DNA (coconut foliar decay virus DNA), which feature the stem-loop structure but not the translation start(s) for the open reading frames ORF1 and/or ORF2, have a distinctly higher promoter activity in plants than promoters derived from CFDV-DNA which do not correspond to these requirements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 1/00; A01H 5/00; C12N 1/19; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/01 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12N 15/83 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); C12N 15/8216 (2013.01); C12N 2750/00022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904022A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730535 A1 19990121; AU 9065098 A 19990210; CA 2296796 A1 19990128; EP 1000165 A1 20000517; WO 9904022 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050630

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROHDE, WOLFGANG

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKER, DIETER

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RANDLES, JOHN, W.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEHN, ALAIN, C/O MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR...

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALAMINI, FRANCESCO

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROHDE, WOLFGANG

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKER, DIETER

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RANDLES, JOHN, W.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEHN, ALAIN, C/O MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR...

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALAMINI, FRANCESCO

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE