Global Patent Index - EP 1000178 A1

EP 1000178 A1 2000-05-17 - METHOD FOR USING COAL FINES IN A MELT-DOWN GASIFIER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR USING COAL FINES IN A MELT-DOWN GASIFIER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWERTUNG VON FEINKOHLE IN EINEM EINSCHMELZVERGASER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE FINES DANS UN GAZEIFICATEUR A FUSION

Publication

EP 1000178 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930525 A

Priority

  • AT 9800165 W
  • AT 115797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901583A1] The invention relates to a method for producing liquid metal, in particular liquid pig iron (9) or liquid steel intermediates from metalliferous elements, in particular from partially or totally reduced sponge iron (3) in a melt-down gasifier (1). Carbon-containing material, consisting at least partially of coal fines (16) and coal dust (13), is fed with oxygen or an oxygen-containing gas to a bed (4) formed of said carbon-containing material. The metalliferous elements are melted down, forming a reduction gas, optionally after preliminary final reduction. After drying, the coal fines (16) and coal dust (13) that are to be used are mixed in the warm state with bitumen (20) and then briquetted in the cold state. The briquettes (25) thus produced are introduced to the melt-down gasifier (1) in the cold state and subjected to shock heating (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/00 (2006.01); C21B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/0006 (2013.01); C10L 5/16 (2013.01); C10L 5/361 (2013.01); C21B 13/002 (2013.01); C21B 13/0066 (2013.01); C21B 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901583 A1 19990114; AT 200798 T 20010515; AT 407053 B 20001227; AT A115797 A 20000415; AU 741816 B2 20011213; AU 8091698 A 19990125; BR 9810664 A 20001003; CA 2294272 A1 19990114; CA 2294272 C 20041026; CN 1074047 C 20011031; CN 1261923 A 20000802; DE 59800653 D1 20010531; EP 1000178 A1 20000517; EP 1000178 B1 20010425; JP 2002508809 A 20020319; JP 4184448 B2 20081119; MY 115594 A 20030731; PL 189751 B1 20050930; PL 338039 A1 20000925; RU 2188239 C2 20020827; SK 188799 A3 20000711; SK 284445 B6 20050401; TR 9903306 T2 20000721; TW 442571 B 20010623; US 6332911 B1 20011225; ZA 9805866 B 19990127

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800653

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200798 T

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120703

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100704

2012-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090713

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800653 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200798 T 20010515

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE