Global Patent Index - EP 1000179 B9

EP 1000179 B9 2002-09-25 - HIGH STRENGTH Al-Mg-Zn-Si ALLOY FOR WELDED STRUCTURES AND BRAZING APPLICATION

Title (en)

HIGH STRENGTH Al-Mg-Zn-Si ALLOY FOR WELDED STRUCTURES AND BRAZING APPLICATION

Title (de)

HOCHVERFORMBARE, KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE AL-LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE AL-MG-ZN-SI A HAUTE RESISTANCE POUR STRUCTURES SOUDEES ET BRASAGE

Publication

EP 1000179 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 98941409 A

Priority

  • EP 98941409 A
  • EP 9804962 W
  • EP 97202366 A
  • EP 98200561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907906A1] Aluminium-magnesium-zinc-silicon alloy, preferably in the form of a plate or a sheet or an extrusion, having the following composition in weight percent: Mg 0.5 - 1.5; Zn 0.1 - 3.8; Si 0.05 - 1.5; Mn 0.2 - 0.8; Zr 0.05 - 0.25; Cr 0.3 max.; Cu < 0.3; Fe 0.5 max.; Ag 0.4 max.; Ti 0.2 max.; balance Al and inevitable impurities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/10; C22C 21/08; C22F 1/05; C22F 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 35/28 (2006.01); B32B 15/01 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22C 21/10 (2006.01); C22F 1/05 (2006.01); C22F 1/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/08 (2013.01); B23K 35/288 (2013.01); B32B 15/016 (2013.01); C22C 21/10 (2013.01); C22F 1/05 (2013.01); C22F 1/053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907906 A1 19990218; AR 016584 A1 20010725; AT 217912 T 20020615; AU 725069 B2 20001005; AU 8978998 A 19990301; CA 2299449 A1 19990218; CA 2299449 C 20060919; DE 69805527 D1 20020627; DE 69805527 T2 20021128; EP 1000179 A1 20000517; EP 1000179 B1 20020522; EP 1000179 B9 20020925; KR 100502776 B1 20050725; KR 20010022600 A 20010326; NO 20000559 A 20000203; NO 20000559 D0 20000203; US 6302973 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69805527

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69805527

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CORUS ALUMINIUM PROFILTECHNIK GMBH

2008-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ALERIS ALUMINUM KOBLENZ GMBH

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Free text: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH#CARL-SPAETER-STRASSE 10#56070 KOBLENZ (DE) $ CORUS ALUMINIUM PROFILTECHNIK GMBH#BERGSTRASSE 17#88267 VOGT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH#CARL-SPAETER-STRASSE 10#56070 KOBLENZ (DE) $ CORUS ALUMINIUM PROFILTECHNIK GMBH#BERGSTRASSE 17#88267 VOGT (DE)

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805527 20020627

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217912 T 20020615

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORUS ALUMINIUM PROFILTECHNIK GMBH

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOOGOVENS ALUMINIUM PROFILTECHNIK GMBH

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB LI NL SE