Global Patent Index - EP 1000188 A1

EP 1000188 A1 2000-05-17 - POLYVINYL ALCOHOL BASED NONWOVEN ARTICLES WITH VIVID COLORS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

POLYVINYL ALCOHOL BASED NONWOVEN ARTICLES WITH VIVID COLORS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

AUF DER BASIS VON POLYVINYLALKOHOL HERGESTELLTE VLIESSTOFFMATERIALIEN MIT LEUCHTENDEN FARBEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ARTICLES NON TISSES A BASE D'ALCOOL POLYVINYLIQUE A COULEURS VIVES ET TECHNIQUES DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1000188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97935260 A

Priority

US 9713577 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906622A1] Vividly colored absorbent articles useful as wiping articles and a method for their manufacture. A preferred article is characterized by (a) a nonwoven web comprised of organic fibers having a plurality of pendant hydroxyl groups; (b) a binder comprising a cross-linked polyvinyl alcohol and a hydrophobic polymer coated on at least a portion of the fibers, (c) pigment distributed within the binder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/10 (2006.01); A47L 13/16 (2006.01); D04H 1/4258 (2012.01); D04H 1/4282 (2012.01); D04H 1/60 (2006.01); D04H 1/64 (2012.01); D06M 15/333 (2006.01); D06N 3/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/02 (2006.01); D06M 101/06 (2006.01); D06M 101/16 (2006.01); D06M 101/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4282 (2013.01); D04H 1/4258 (2013.01); D04H 1/60 (2013.01); D04H 1/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906622 A1 19990211; AU 3824497 A 19990222; AU 734446 B2 20010614; CA 2296490 A1 19990211; DE 69716773 D1 20021205; DE 69716773 T2 20030703; EP 1000188 A1 20000517; EP 1000188 B1 20021030; JP 2001512190 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030731

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716773 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: POLYVINYL ALCOHOL BASED ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH VIVID COLORS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL