Global Patent Index - EP 1000189 A1

EP 1000189 A1 2000-05-17 - SEWING METHOD AND SEWING MACHINE FOR RELEASING A TENSION THREAD FROM A PASSAGE FORMED BY A STITCH

Title (en)

SEWING METHOD AND SEWING MACHINE FOR RELEASING A TENSION THREAD FROM A PASSAGE FORMED BY A STITCH

Title (de)

NÄHVERFAHREN UND NÄHMASCHINE DIE DAS FREIMACHEN EINER ZIEHSCHNUR AUS EINER DURCH EINE NÄHNAHT GEFORMTE PASSAGE ERMÖGLICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COUTURE ET MACHINE A COUDRE PERMETTANT DE DEGAGER UN FIL DE TENSION D'UN PASSAGE FORME PAR UN POINT DE COUTURE

Publication

EP 1000189 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98937600 A

Priority

  • FR 9801491 W
  • FR 9708952 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766213A1] The invention concerns a sewing method whereby a tension thread (8), guided and set in a passage (P) of a stitch (3) is moved laterally relative to stitching means (5, 6) between a normal position and a releasing position wherein the tension thread (8) is laterally spaced out of the passage (P), in particular for independently cutting the stitch (3) auxiliary threads (4) and/or the tension thread (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 65/00; D05B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 65/02 (2006.01); D05B 1/20 (2006.01); D05B 35/06 (2006.01); D05B 65/00 (2006.01); D05B 65/06 (2006.01); D05B 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 1/20 (2013.01); D05B 65/00 (2013.01); D05B 29/06 (2013.01); D05D 2303/08 (2013.01); D05D 2305/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904079A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766213 A1 19990122; FR 2766213 B1 19990910; AT 214748 T 20020415; AU 8634098 A 19990210; CA 2295164 A1 19990128; CA 2295164 C 20060919; DE 69804316 D1 20020425; DE 69804316 T2 20021107; DK 1000189 T3 20020708; EP 1000189 A1 20000517; EP 1000189 B1 20020320; ES 2174464 T3 20021101; JP 2001510085 A 20010731; JP 4022043 B2 20071212; PT 1000189 E 20020731; US 6196148 B1 20010306; WO 9904079 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130709

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-20 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Free text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20140109

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-01-17 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Free text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20130109

2012-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110715

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GUILHEM, CHRISTIAN

- Free text: GUILHEM, CHRISTIAN#ROUTE NATIONALE 20#82350 ALBIAS (FR) $ GUILHEM, MARC#ROUTE NATIONALE 20#82350 ALBIAS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- GUILHEM, CHRISTIAN#ROUTE NATIONALE 20#82350 ALBIAS (FR) $ GUILHEM, MARC#ROUTE NATIONALE 20#82350 ALBIAS (FR)

2004-11-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174464 T3

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-07-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804316 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214748 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE