Global Patent Index - EP 1000192 A1

EP 1000192 A1 2000-05-17 - IRON WITH NON-DRIP DEVICE

Title (en)

IRON WITH NON-DRIP DEVICE

Title (de)

DAMPFBÜGELEISEN MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERMEIDEN VON TROPFEN

Title (fr)

FER A VAPEUR AVEC DISPOSITIF ANTI-GOUTTE

Publication

EP 1000192 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98937611 A

Priority

  • FR 9801503 W
  • FR 9709389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766214A1] The invention concerns a steam iron, comprising a sole plate (11) including steam outlets (12) communicating with an evaporation chamber (14), the sole plate (11) and the evaporation chamber (4) being in thermal relationship with heating means, the evaporation chamber (14) communicating with a reservoir (15) through an orifice (16) capable of being closed by a valve (17) arranged in a housing (22). The invention is characterised in that the valve (17) comprises a rod (5) capable of closing the orifice (16), said rod including a shoulder (19) capable of resting on a support (3) integral with a bellows (4) forming at least partially a sealed conduit (31) between the reservoir (15) and the evaporation chamber (14), said support (3) being actuated by a thermostat metal (1) mounted on a wall (29) in thermal relationship with the evaporation chamber (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766214 A1 19990122; FR 2766214 B1 19990917; AU 8634498 A 19990210; BR 9810872 A 20000808; CA 2296740 A1 19990128; CA 2296740 C 20050524; CN 1147639 C 20040428; CN 1264440 A 20000823; DE 69809243 D1 20021212; DE 69809243 T2 20030828; EP 1000192 A1 20000517; EP 1000192 B1 20021106; ES 2186196 T3 20030501; JP 2002508695 A 20020319; JP 4014651 B2 20071128; TR 200000128 T2 20000522; WO 9904081 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809243

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090711

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090711

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090710

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080716

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186196 T3

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809243 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL