Global Patent Index - EP 1000196 A1

EP 1000196 A1 2000-05-17 - MULTI-LAYER SCREEN FOR THE WET AREA OF A PAPER MACHINE AND PRODUCT MANUFACTURED USING THE SAME

Title (en)

MULTI-LAYER SCREEN FOR THE WET AREA OF A PAPER MACHINE AND PRODUCT MANUFACTURED USING THE SAME

Title (de)

MEHRLAGIGES SIEB FÜR DEN NASSBEREICH EINER PAPIERMASCHINE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTES PRODUKT

Title (fr)

TOILE MULTICOUCHE POUR LA REGION HUMIDE D'UNE MACHINE A PAPIER ET PRODUIT FABRIQUE AVEC CELLE-CI

Publication

EP 1000196 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943749 A

Priority

  • DE 19732879 A
  • EP 9804536 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732879A1] The invention relates to a multi-layer screen (10, 11) for the wet area of a paper machine and to a tissue paper produced using the same. The inventive screen consists of threads, preferably woven threads, forming at least two layers. These layers are joined to each other by additional threads (14) which are interlaced with the layers. Together with the threads which make up the layers, the additional threads (14) form constricted points (16), said constricted points being spread across the length and breadth of the screen. A significantly less quantity of water can pass through these points than through the areas adjacent thereto. Arranged in special sequences, the additional threads are a means of influencing the drainage of water through the screen at the constricted points for producing tissue paper with alternating areas of high and low GSM substance. The invention therefore provides a simple means of producing a tissue paper with a flexible, thin, non-homogeneous, net-like structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/10 (2006.01); D03D 11/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/006 (2013.01); D21F 1/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906629A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732879 A1 19990204; DE 19732879 C2 19990722; AR 013263 A1 20001213; AT 209270 T 20011215; AU 730580 B2 20010308; AU 9154898 A 19990222; BR 9811566 A 20000912; CA 2297800 A1 19990211; CN 1272155 A 20001101; CO 5040193 A1 20010529; CZ 20000296 A3 20010912; EP 1000196 A1 20000517; EP 1000196 B1 20011121; ES 2169546 T3 20020701; HR P20000043 A2 20010630; HU 0004860 A2 20010628; JP 2001512192 A 20010821; PL 187485 B1 20040730; PL 338418 A1 20001106; SK 1122000 A3 20000814; TR 200000277 T2 20010321; WO 9906629 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050722

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050721

2006-03-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-07 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169546 T3

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000124;SI PAYMENT 20000124

2001-11-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209270 T 20011215

2001-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000124;SI PAYMENT 20000124