Global Patent Index - EP 1000207 A1

EP 1000207 A1 2000-05-17 - METHOD FOR FIXING A COVERING CONSISTING OF PLANKS, LATHS OR THE LIKE AND RESULTING COVERING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FIXING A COVERING CONSISTING OF PLANKS, LATHS OR THE LIKE AND RESULTING COVERING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINER VERKLEIDUNG BESTEHEND AUS BRETTERN, LATTEN ODER ÄHNLICHEM UND EINE SO HERGESTELLTE VERKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE EN PLACE D'UN REVETEMENT CONSTITUE DE PLANCHES, LATTES OU SIMILAIRES ET REVETEMENT OBTENU

Publication

EP 1000207 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98940295 A

Priority

  • FR 9801602 W
  • FR 9709921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766855A1] The invention concerns a method for fixing against a support (S), in particular, a floor, a covering consisting of planks, laths, wooden panels (1) which consist in the levelling the surface to be covered, in fixing against said surface (S), side by side planks (1) leaving a space between the latter and the floor. The invention is characterised in that the spacing and fixing of the planks (1) is obtained by means of a couple of elements (3, 4) distributed over the length of said planks, elements in the form of blocks one (3) of which is fixed transversely on the plank lower surface and the second (4) on the floor, the surfaces opposite said blocks (3, 4) comprising matching zones (7) capable of being flush mounted mutually blocking said elements (3, 4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/10; E04F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/21 (2006.01); E04F 13/10 (2006.01); E04F 15/02 (2006.01); E04F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02033 (2013.01); E04F 13/10 (2013.01); E04F 15/04 (2013.01); E04F 2015/02116 (2013.01); E04F 2201/042 (2013.01); E04F 2201/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906649A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766855 A1 19990205; FR 2766855 B1 19991008; AT 241066 T 20030615; DE 69814867 D1 20030626; DE 69814867 T2 20040311; EP 1000207 A1 20000517; EP 1000207 B1 20030521; ES 2198740 T3 20040201; JP 2001512199 A 20010821; US 6286272 B1 20010911; WO 9906649 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130606

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100721

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69814867

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090718

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-13 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2009-03-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198740 T3

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SANDOZ JEAN-LUC

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1000207E

2003-11-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814867 P 20030626

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE