Global Patent Index - EP 1000208 A1

EP 1000208 A1 2000-05-17 - FLAT STRIP LAMELLA FOR REINFORCING BUILDING COMPONENTS AND METHOD FOR PLACING A FLAT STRIP LAMELLA ON A COMPONENT

Title (en)

FLAT STRIP LAMELLA FOR REINFORCING BUILDING COMPONENTS AND METHOD FOR PLACING A FLAT STRIP LAMELLA ON A COMPONENT

Title (de)

FLACHBAND-LAMELLE ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG VON BAUTEILEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ANBRINGUNG DER FLACHBAND-LAMELLE AN EINEM BAUTEIL

Title (fr)

LAMELLE DE BANDE PLATE POUR RENFORCER DES ELEMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION, AINSI QUE PROCEDE POUR POSER CETTE LAMELLE SUR UN ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 1000208 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941330 A

Priority

  • DE 19733067 A
  • EP 9804383 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19733067A1] The invention relates to a flat strip lamella (10) for reinforcing load-bearing or load transferring building components e.g. concrete, wood, steel, natural stone or masonry. The flat strip lamella (10) has a composite structure consisting of a plurality of parallel aligned, bendable or flexible carrying fibres (26) and a binding matrix (28) joining the carrying fibres to each other and making them shear resistant. The lamella can be attached facewise to the surface of the building component to be reinforced, using adhesive (16). In order to be able to bend the flat strip lamella over corner edges of a building component, the binding matrix (28) consists of a thermoplastic synthetic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0218 (2013.01); Y10T 156/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906651A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733067 A1 19990204; AT 208852 T 20011115; AU 738490 B2 20010920; AU 8975298 A 19990222; BR 9811578 A 20000829; CA 2278650 A1 19990211; CA 2278650 C 20030121; CN 1127603 C 20031112; CN 1251152 A 20000419; DK 1000208 T3 20020225; EP 1000208 A1 20000517; EP 1000208 B1 20011114; ES 2166612 T3 20020416; HK 1024039 A1 20020510; HU 0004549 A2 20010428; HU 0004549 A3 20020128; HU 223369 B1 20040628; IL 134118 A 20030529; IL 134118 D0 20010430; JP 2001512200 A 20010821; KR 100417892 B1 20040211; KR 20000070791 A 20001125; NO 314002 B1 20030113; NO 994733 A 19990929; NO 994733 D0 19990929; NZ 336978 A 20010831; PL 335439 A1 20000425; PT 1000208 E 20020531; US 2002124930 A1 20020912; WO 9906651 A1 19990211; WO 9906651 A8 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160803

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-24 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130731

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090716

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-01-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG

- Free text: SIKA AG, VORM. KASPAR WINKLER & CO.#TUEFFENWIES 16-22#CH-8048 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIKA SCHWEIZ AG#TUEFFENWIES 16-22#8064 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG

2003-09-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-03-31 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG CH

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166612 T3

2002-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020118

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802160 20011220

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2001-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208852 T 20011115

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIKA AG, VORM. KASPAR WINKLER & CO.

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990618

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE