Global Patent Index - EP 1000228 A1

EP 1000228 A1 2000-05-17 - VALVE FOR SUCKING UP GASES FROM AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CRANKCASE

Title (en)

VALVE FOR SUCKING UP GASES FROM AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CRANKCASE

Title (de)

KURBELGEHÄUSE-ENTLÜFTUNGSVENTIL FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

VALVE DE REASPIRATION DES GAZ DU CARTER POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1000228 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936331 A

Priority

  • DE 19732367 A
  • EP 9803548 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732367A1] The invention concerns a valve for sucking up gases from an internal combustion engine crankcase (10) comprising a body (14, 16), a gas intake duct (32) connected to the crankcase inner space (12), a gas evacuating duct (28) connected to an air sucking duct of the internal combustion engine and a membrane (18) dividing the valve body (14, 16) into an inner chamber (22) on the crankcase side and an outer chamber (24) and having a suction valve attachment (34). Said membrane (18), jointly with the suction valve attachment (34), opens or closes at will the gas evacuating duct (28) according to the pressure difference between the two chambers (22, 24). The valve body (14, 16) outer chamber (24) is connected to the gas intake duct (32) and a ventilating duct (26) is provided on the crankcase side, said duct connecting the inner chamber (22) valve body (14, 16), on the crankcase side, to ambient pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/00 (2006.01); F01M 13/02 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906679A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732367 A1 19990204; AT 224002 T 20020915; CN 1097141 C 20021225; CN 1265173 A 20000830; EP 1000228 A1 20000517; EP 1000228 B1 20020911; JP 2001512207 A 20010821; KR 100491400 B1 20050525; KR 20010014128 A 20010226; US 6158423 A 20001212; WO 9906679 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805533

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130612

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130612

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130612

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805533 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224002 T 20020915

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE